Senate | 06/01/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 5040 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1940 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1714 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1144 | |
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 882 | |
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 435 | |
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 435 | |
Senate | 03/03/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 367 | |
Senate | 02/19/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/19/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |