E | 05/19/2009 | Effective on 9/1/09 | ||
E | 05/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2617 | |
E | 05/07/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2140 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2867 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2117 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2140 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2059 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2474 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Record vote | RV#557 | Journal Page: 2474 |
House | 05/05/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2474 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2474 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2395 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2395 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2394 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2394 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 705 | Journal Page: 2394 |
House | 05/02/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2336 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 1596 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1596 | |
House | 04/17/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1567 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1141 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1091 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1091 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1091 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1091 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1091 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1091 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1090 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1073 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1012 | |
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 852 | |
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 824 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 777 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 610 | |
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 436 | |
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 436 | |
Senate | 02/19/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/19/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |