House | 04/20/2009 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 1596 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1596 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1268 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1108 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1036 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1036 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1036 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1035 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1035 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1035 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1035 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 979 | |
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 585 | |
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 436 | |
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 436 | |
Senate | 02/19/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/19/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |