House | 05/18/2009 | Referred to subcommittee | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2206 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2206 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1924 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1661 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1483 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1483 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1483 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1483 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1482 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 1482 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Ogden | Journal Page: 1482 |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1482 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1482 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1482 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1226 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 436 | |
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 436 | |
Senate | 02/19/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/19/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |