E | 05/05/2009 | Effective on 9/1/09 | ||
E | 05/05/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2050 | |
E | 04/23/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1416 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1760 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1370 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1416 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1351 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Record vote | RV#223 | Journal Page: 1685 |
House | 04/22/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1685 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1685 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1675 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1675 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB3899 | Journal Page: 1675 |
House | 04/22/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1719 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 1267 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1267 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1181 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1013 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 986 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 986 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 986 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 986 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 986 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 986 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 986 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 821 | |
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 437 | |
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 437 | |
Senate | 02/20/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/20/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |