Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB997 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Duncan S.B. No. 997
 (In the Senate - Filed February 20, 2009; March 9, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Finance; March 31, 2009,
 reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 14, Nays 0;
 March 31, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the administration of and exemptions from the gas
 production tax.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (a), Section 201.058, Tax Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a) The exemptions described by Sections 202.056, 202.057,
 [202.059,] and 202.060 apply to the taxes imposed by this chapter as
 authorized by and subject to the certifications and approvals
 required by those sections.
 SECTION 2. Subsection (a), Section 201.203, Tax Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a) On or before the 20th day of the second month following
 the month in which gas was produced, the [last day of each calendar
 month, each] producer shall file a report with the comptroller on
 forms prescribed by the comptroller. The report must contain the
 following information concerning gas produced during the
 [preceding calendar] month being reported:
 (1) the gross amount of gas produced that is subject to
 the tax imposed by this chapter;
 (2) the leases from which the gas was produced;
 (3) the names and addresses of the first purchasers of
 the gas; and
 (4) other information the comptroller may reasonably
 require.
 SECTION 3. Subsection (a), Section 201.2035, Tax Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a) On or before the 20th day of the second month following
 the month in which gas was purchased from a producer, the [last day
 of each calendar month, each] first purchaser must file a report
 with the comptroller on forms prescribed by the comptroller. The
 report must contain the following information concerning gas
 purchased from a producer during the [preceding calendar] month
 being reported:
 (1) the gross amount of gas purchased from each
 producer;
 (2) the price paid for the gas;
 (3) the leases from which the gas was produced; and
 (4) other information the comptroller may reasonably
 require.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *