E | 02/20/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 313 | |
E | 02/18/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 284 | |
House | 02/18/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 340 | |
Senate | 02/18/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 277 | |
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 284 | |
Senate | 02/17/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 237 | |
House | 02/11/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 256 | |
House | 02/11/2009 | Record vote | RV#25 | Journal Page: 256 |
House | 02/11/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 256 | |
House | 02/11/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 255 | |
House | 02/11/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 258 | |
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 200 | |
Senate | 02/06/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |