E | 03/12/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 498 | |
E | 03/10/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 469 | |
House | 03/10/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 631 | |
Senate | 03/10/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 442 | |
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 469 | |
Senate | 03/09/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 418 | |
House | 03/05/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 564 | |
House | 03/05/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 564 | |
House | 03/05/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/03/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/25/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 434 | |
House | 02/19/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 365 | |
Senate | 02/18/2009 | Printed in full | Journal Page: 285 | |
Senate | 02/18/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 281 | |
Senate | 02/18/2009 | Read | Journal Page: 281 | |
Senate | 02/18/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 281 | |
Senate | 02/12/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/12/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |