Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR24 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            2009S0099-1 01/15/09
 By: Shapiro S.C.R. No. 24


 CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Mary Kay Ash, founder of the Dallas-based,
 internationally known cosmetics firm that bears her name, became
 one of the most successful and respected American business leaders
 of the 20th century; and
 WHEREAS, She was born on May 12, 1918, in Hot Wells, Texas,
 and grew up in Houston; Mrs. Ash enjoyed a successful career in
 direct sales before retiring in 1963; following her retirement, she
 embarked on a book-writing project designed to help women survive
 in the male-dominated business world; upon reviewing her early
 notes for the book, she realized that she had inadvertently created
 a marketing plan for a successful "dream company"; and
 WHEREAS, On Friday, September 13, 1963, with her life savings
 of $5,000 and with the help of her 20-year-old son Richard Rogers,
 she launched Mary Kay Cosmetics; within two years, the company's
 wholesale sales had reached almost $1 million; in 2006, the company
 recorded $2.25 billion in wholesale sales and had an independent
 sales force of more than 1.7 million beauty consultants in over 30
 markets around the world; and
 WHEREAS, Powerfully influenced by her mother's struggle to
 support her family and by her own experience of gender
 discrimination, Mary Kay Ash intended her company to provide women
 with unlimited opportunity for personal and financial success, and
 since its founding, Mary Kay Cosmetics has continued to reflect
 that goal; and
 WHEREAS, Throughout her life, Mrs. Ash showed others how to
 give; a generous and strong woman, she believed in putting God
 first, and she believed that with praise and encouragement, anyone
 could succeed; and
 WHEREAS, In 1996, Mrs. Ash established the Mary Kay Ash
 Charitable Foundation for the purpose of funding research on the
 leading cancers affecting women; today the foundation also supports
 efforts to prevent violence against women and to help women who have
 been victims of abuse; every October, the foundation observes
 National Domestic Violence Awareness Month by awarding grants to
 deserving women's shelters across the country; in 2008, the
 foundation awarded $20,000 grants to more than 150 shelters; and
 WHEREAS, A phenomenally talented lady who led by example,
 Mrs. Ash authored an autobiography, a motivational book, and a
 volume about management, all of which became best sellers; and
 WHEREAS, The recipient of myriad accolades, Mary Kay Ash was
 named the Most Outstanding Woman in Business in the 20th Century by
 Lifetime Television and was chosen as one of the 25 most influential
 business leaders of the last 25 years by PBS and the Wharton School
 of the University of Pennsylvania in 2004; she was elected to the
 Business Hall of Fame by Fortune magazine and was designated a
 Horatio Alger Distinguished American Citizen; Mary Kay Cosmetics
 has been ranked by Fortune magazine as one of the 100 best companies
 to work for in America and as one of the 10 best companies for women;
 and
 WHEREAS, Mary Kay Ash passed away on November 22, 2001,
 having achieved the pinnacle of success and having established a
 legacy that will continue to provide opportunity and hope for women
 for years to come; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby designate May 12, 2009, as Mary Kay Ash Day in the State of
 Texas.
 Designating May 12, 2009, as Mary Kay Ash Day in the State of Texas.