House | 05/23/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/22/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/22/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4570 | |
House | 05/21/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2550 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2432 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1929 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1929 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1929 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1929 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1929 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1107 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 814 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 814 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |