E | 06/19/2009 | Vetoed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5158 | |
E | 06/03/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5156 | |
House | 06/03/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6968 | |
Senate | 06/02/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 5152 | |
Senate | 06/01/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5155 | |
Senate | 06/01/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 5109 | |
House | 06/01/2009 | Record vote | RV#1739 | Journal Page: 6955 |
House | 06/01/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 6955 | |
House | 06/01/2009 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 6954 | |
House | 06/01/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 6954 | |
House | 05/30/2009 | 1 hr. notice-to suspend rules | Journal Page: 6023 | |
House | 05/30/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 6902 | |
House | 05/30/2009 | Reported favorably as amended | ||
House | 05/30/2009 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | ||
House | 05/30/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/28/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/28/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/25/2009 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 4818 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 4077 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2531 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2531 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2531 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2531 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2531 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 2358 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1231 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1025 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1025 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 1018 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |