E | 05/13/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2395 | |
E | 05/05/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2050 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2550 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2048 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2050 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1951 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2341 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 2341 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1944 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1679 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 1297 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |