E | 05/06/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2097 | |
E | 04/27/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1661 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1923 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1616 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1661 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1484 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1794 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 1794 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Printed in full | Journal Page: 1612 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1679 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 1296 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |