E | 05/30/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4976 | |
E | 05/20/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2618 | |
House | 05/20/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4216 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2577 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2617 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2518 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3957 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 3957 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 3435 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3040 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2150 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2150 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Read | Journal Page: 2150 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2149 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |