Senate | 04/23/2009 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | Journal Page: 1367 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 921 | |
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Meeting cancelled | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Referred to Government Organization | Journal Page: 492 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 492 | |
Senate | 01/28/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/28/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |