House | 05/21/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 4301 | |
House | 05/20/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 4219 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2592 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2592 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2592 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2592 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 2569 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2442 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1993 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1993 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 1988 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |