House | 05/20/2009 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3041 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Referred to Corrections | Journal Page: 1267 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1267 | |
House | 04/06/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1092 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 900 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 864 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 864 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 864 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 864 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 864 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 864 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 863 | |
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 736 | |
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 494 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 494 | |
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |