Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR27 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            81R3954 CBE-D
 By: Ellis S.J.R. No. 27


 A JOINT RESOLUTION
 post-ratifying Amendment XXIV to the Constitution of the United
 States prohibiting the denial or abridgment of the right to vote for
 failure to pay any poll tax or other tax.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. The 87th Congress of the United States, on August
 27, 1962, in the form of Senate Joint Resolution No. 29, proposed to
 the legislatures of the several states an amendment to the
 Constitution of the United States, and by a proclamation dated
 February 4, 1964, published at 29 Federal Register 1715-16 and at 78
 Statutes at Large 1117-18, the Administrator of General Services,
 Bernard L. Boutin--in the presence of native Texan, President
 Lyndon Baines Johnson--declared the amendment to have been ratified
 by the legislatures of 38 of the 50 states, thereby becoming
 Amendment XXIV to the United States Constitution, pursuant to
 Article V thereof, and reading as follows:
 "AMENDMENT XXIV.
 "SECTION 1. The right of citizens of the United
 States to vote in any primary or other election for
 President or Vice President, for electors for
 President or Vice President, or for Senator or
 Representative in Congress, shall not be denied or
 abridged by the United States or any State by reason of
 failure to pay any poll tax or other tax.
 "SECTION 2. The Congress shall have power to enforce
 this article by appropriate legislation."
 SECTION 2. While the congress was still deliberating on the
 poll tax amendment in August of 1962, President John Fitzgerald
 Kennedy urged the United States House of Representatives to follow
 the lead of the Senate and propose the amendment for the
 consideration of the state legislatures ". . . to finally
 eliminate this outmoded and arbitrary bar to voting. American
 citizens should not have to pay to vote." And in witnessing the
 issuance of Amendment XXIV's certificate of validity 17 months
 later, Kennedy's successor, President Johnson, noted that
 abolishing the tax requirement ". . . reaffirmed the simple but
 unbreakable theme of this Republic. Nothing is so valuable as
 liberty, and nothing is so necessary to liberty as the freedom to
 vote without bans or barriers. . . . A change in our Constitution
 is a serious event. . . . There can now be no one too poor to vote."
 SECTION 3. Although Amendment XXIV has been the law of the
 land since 1964, some 13 years following its effective date, it
 received symbolic post-ratification in 1977 from the General
 Assembly of the Commonwealth of Virginia, as reflected in the
 Congressional Record of March 28, 1977, which printed the full text
 of Virginia's post-ratification; 12 years after that, the amendment
 gained ceremonial post-ratification in 1989 from the General
 Assembly of the State of North Carolina, as reflected in the
 Congressional Record of June 6, 1989, which printed the full text of
 North Carolina's post-ratification; and nearly 13 years after that,
 the amendment acquired its most recent post-ratification in 2002
 from the Legislature of the State of Alabama, as reflected in the
 Congressional Record of September 26, 2002, which printed the full
 text of Alabama's post-ratification.
 SECTION 4. The Legislature of the State of Texas--one of
 only five states still levying a poll tax by 1964--has never
 approved Amendment XXIV to the Constitution of the United States,
 but precedent makes clear the opportunity of Texas to post-ratify
 the amendment in a manner similar to the actions of lawmakers in
 Alabama, North Carolina, and Virginia.
 SECTION 5. The Legislature of the State of Texas, as a
 symbolic gesture, hereby post-ratifies Amendment XXIV to the
 Constitution of the United States.
 SECTION 6. Pursuant to Public Law No. 98-497, the Texas
 secretary of state shall notify the archivist of the United States
 of the action of the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas, Regular
 Session, 2009, by forwarding to the archivist an official copy of
 this resolution.
 SECTION 7. The Texas secretary of state shall also forward
 official copies of this resolution to both United States senators
 from Texas, to all United States representatives from Texas, to the
 vice president of the United States in his capacity as presiding
 officer of the United States Senate, and to the speaker of the
 United States House of Representatives, with the request that this
 resolution be printed in full in the Congressional Record.