Senate | 05/11/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1140 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 815 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 815 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |