House | 05/01/2009 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 2296 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2296 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1926 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1661 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1454 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1454 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1454 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1453 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1453 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1453 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1453 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1418 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1298 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1230 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 816 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 816 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |