House | 05/22/2009 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/15/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/15/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3953 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 2687 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2687 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2299 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1936 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1816 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1816 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1816 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1815 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1815 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1815 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 1815 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Averitt | Journal Page: 1815 |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1814 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1814 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1055 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 816 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 816 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |