Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR295 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 295
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas takes pleasure in
 recognizing Mogiaree Chastain Richardson on the grand occasion
 of her 99th birthday on February 25, 2009; and
 WHEREAS, Mogiaree Chastain was born February 25, 1910, in
 the town of LaFayette in Upshur County, Texas; she and her late
 brother, Elzy, were the children of Ethel Gertrude McIntyre and
 John Alexander Chastain; and
 WHEREAS, Mogiaree is the great-granddaughter of James A.
 Chastain and Susanna Chastain, who arrived in Texas in 1872; with
 the exception of six months, Mogiaree has spent her entire life
 in LaFayette, Gilmer, and Pittsburg, Texas; and
 WHEREAS, She moved to Pittsburg in the late 1920s, where
 she worked at the Piggly Wiggly and served as a manager at
 Davenport's department store; she was also a clerk for her father
 when he was a justice of the peace; and
 WHEREAS, Mogiaree married Bryant Roscoe "Rich" Richardson
 on September 19, 1945; Rich served his country as a lieutenant
 commander in the United States Navy during World War II and was a
 superintendent of schools in Gilmer; and
 WHEREAS, An exemplary lady who is known for her warmth and
 sense of humor, Mogiaree is cherished as a special treasure in
 the hearts of her family members and friends; and
 WHEREAS, Beloved for her endearing and engaging
 personality, Mogiaree is noted for living each day to the
 fullest, and over the years, she has consistently been a source
 of strength and much joy to others; and
 WHEREAS, In honor of Mogiaree's birthday, relatives,
 friends, and visitors from out of state are gathering to show
 their affection and celebrate with her; the gathering is taking
 place on February 28 at one of Mogiaree's favorite places to
 dine, the Catfish King in Mount Pleasant; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 81st
 Legislature, hereby congratulate Mogiaree Chastain Richardson on
 the occasion of her 99th birthday and extend to her best wishes
 for a joyous celebration; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared in
 honor of Mogiaree Chastain Richardson.
 Eltife
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on February 23, 2009.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate