Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR401 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 401
 In Memory
 of
 Vyarl Wayne Martin
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas joins the
 citizens of Hurst in mourning the loss of Vyarl Wayne Martin, who
 died January 4, 2009, at the age of 46; and
 WHEREAS, Vyarl Martin was born in Decatur on April 20,
 1962; he grew up on a farm in Duke, Oklahoma, and earned a
 bachelor's degree in aviation technology; he married the love of
 his life, Kim Olivadoti, on May 28, 1994; and
 WHEREAS, Vyarl honorably served his country as a member of
 the United States Army, Navy, and Coast Guard; he was called to
 active duty after September 11, 2001, and in September of 2005,
 he was a key participant in the mass-shelter operations in
 Houston following the devastation of New Orleans by Hurricane
 Katrina; for his outstanding service to his fellow countrymen,
 Lieutenant Commander Martin was awarded the Coast Guard
 Achievement Medal and the Army Achievement Medal; and
 WHEREAS, Vyarl Martin loved to fly and was an expert pilot
 of jets, multi-engine planes, and helicopters; at the time of his
 death, he had been piloting for over three years for Petroleum
 Helicopter, Incorporated, of Morgan City, Louisiana; and
 WHEREAS, Vyarl Martin was beloved and highly respected by
 all who knew him; he was a true patriot and a man of honor and
 integrity who gave unselfishly to others; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 81st
 Legislature, hereby extend sincere condolences to the family of
 Lieutenant Commander Vyarl Wayne Martin; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 the members of his family as an expression of deepest sympathy
 from the Texas Senate, and that when the Senate adjourns this
 day, it do so in memory of Vyarl Martin.
 Nelson
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on March 10, 2009, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate