SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 403 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas is pleased to recognize Richard Stephen Kitchen, who is retiring as assistant chief of police for the North Richland Hills Police Department on May 29, 2009, after an exemplary career in law enforcement spanning some 38 years; and WHEREAS, Richard Kitchen served nearly eight years in the police department of Waukegan, Illinois, before joining the North Richland Hills Police Department as a patrolman on December 8, 1978; and WHEREAS, He rose to the rank of captain by 1986 and served with distinction, commanding the Patrol, Technical Services, Administrative Services, and Criminal Investigations Divisions and graduating from the 174th Session of the Federal Bureau of Investigation National Academy; and WHEREAS, He was named assistant chief of police on April 10, 1999, and commanded the Operations Bureau until February 1, 2007, when he began his assignment as commander of the Management Services Bureau; and WHEREAS, Throughout his tenure with the North Richland Hills Police Department, Assistant Chief Richard Kitchen has handled his many responsibilities and served his community with exceptional dedication and loyalty; he received the Meritorious Service Award in 1980, and he was named Officer of the Year in 1981 and Supervisor of the Year in 1983 and 1986; and WHEREAS, He has been an exemplary public servant, and his presence in the North Richland Hills Police Department will be greatly missed; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 81st Legislature, hereby commend Assistant Chief of Police Richard Stephen Kitchen for his many years of valuable service in the North Richland Hills Police Department and extend to him best wishes for the retirement years ahead; and, be it further RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for him as an expression of esteem from the Texas Senate. Nelson ________________________________ President of the Senate I hereby certify that the above Resolution was adopted by the Senate on March 10, 2009. ________________________________ Secretary of the Senate ________________________________ Member, Texas Senate