Senate | 04/30/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1936 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1776 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1776 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1776 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1776 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1140 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Referred to Veteran Affairs & Military Instal | Journal Page: 817 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 817 | |
Senate | 03/11/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |