Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR51 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Van de Putte S.R. No. 51


 SENATE RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Between the surrender of Japan on September 2,
 1945, and the dissolution of the Soviet Union on December 25
 through 26, 1991, the world witnessed a period of military,
 economic, and ideological confrontation known as the Cold War;
 and
 WHEREAS, Although the Cold War never erupted into a
 full-scale armed conflict between the world's superpowers, it
 gave impetus to a number of localized hot wars, as well as to a
 massive military buildup on the part of both the United States
 and the Soviet Union; the consequent demands on the United States
 military personnel were often arduous and dangerous; and
 WHEREAS, In the National Defense Authorization Act for
 Fiscal Year 2002, the congress authorized the United States
 Department of Defense to issue a Cold War Service Medal, to be
 given to each member of the United States military who served
 satisfactorily on active duty during the Cold War era; the
 Department of Defense has refused, however, to create such an
 award; instead, since 1999, the department has made available a
 Cold War Recognition Certificate, to be given to those who served
 during the Cold War either as a member of the armed forces or as a
 federal employee; and
 WHEREAS, Cold War veterans believe that this certificate
 scarcely suffices to recognize the sacrifices they bore or the
 service they rendered; since the certificate was first offered,
 the American Legion, VFW, Reserve Officers Association, Combat
 Infantrymen's Association, Cold War Veterans Association, and
 AMVETS have all expressed the desire that service in the Cold War
 be honored with an official medal; and
 WHEREAS, A medal that honors service similar to that of
 Cold War veterans already exists and, if made available to those
 veterans, would both pay them the tribute they are owed and
 resolve the Pentagon's concern about the cost of issuing a new
 award; the American Defense Service Medal, created by Executive
 Order 8808, is given to service personnel who served between
 September 8, 1939, following the outbreak of war in Europe, and
 December 7, 1941, when Japan bombed Pearl Harbor; as during the
 Cold War, the United States military spent this period bracing
 for armed hostilities; and
 WHEREAS, A precedent for expanding the dates of
 eligibility for the American Defense Service Medal exists with
 the National Defense Service Medal; initially awarded for
 service during the period of the Korean War, the National Defense
 Service Medal was subsequently awarded for service during the
 period of the Vietnam War, Desert Shield and Desert Storm, and
 the Global War on Terror; and
 WHEREAS, The heraldry, order of precedence, and related
 issues pertaining to the American Defense Service Medal have
 already been settled; the only change in the medal that would be
 required would be the removal of the original dates of
 eligibility, which are presently engraved on the reverse;
 removing these dates will also facilitate the reopening of this
 award for service during a similar period of emergency in the
 future; and
 WHEREAS, There is little doubt that Cold War veterans will
 prefer to purchase the American Defense Service Medal as opposed
 to unofficial commemorative medals, which are not authorized to
 be worn on uniforms, thus significantly reducing the cost to the
 defense department for providing this award; and
 WHEREAS, Those who served in the United States Army, Navy,
 Marines, Air Force, and Coast Guard during the years of the Cold
 War made an immeasurable contribution to the safety of this
 country and its allies, and they are indeed deserving of
 appropriate recognition; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 81st
 Legislature, hereby respectfully urge the president of the
 United States to modify Executive Order 8808 so as to award the
 American Defense Service Medal to United States armed forces
 personnel who served on active duty in the period after September
 1, 1945, and before December 27, 1991; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That the secretary of the senate forward an
 official copy of this resolution to the president of the United
 States.
  _______________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on January 28, 2009.
  _______________________________
  Secretary of the Senate