E
|
05/19/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
05/19/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4618
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
E
|
05/09/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3527
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2084
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3297
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3300
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3176
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1931
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1931
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1931
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1931
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1931
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1931
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1931
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1708
|
Senate
|
05/02/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1277
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1277
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1009
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1662
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#294
|
Journal Page: 1582
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1582
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1582
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1563
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1563
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 941
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2011
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 528
|
House
|
02/28/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 528
|
House
|
01/31/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|