House
|
04/27/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2324
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2011
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 529
|
House
|
02/28/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 529
|
House
|
02/01/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|