E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6918
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5140
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5054
|
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6468
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1674
|
Journal Page: 6468
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6467
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5049
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4587
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6281
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6281
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4326
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4326
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House appoints conferees w/inst-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4032
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4032
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4032
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
House appoints conferees with instructions
|
|
Journal Page: 5942
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5806
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5806
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5805
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1523
|
Journal Page: 5805
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Motion fails
|
|
Journal Page: 5805
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Motion to concur in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5804
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5397
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3455
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3455
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3455
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3455
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Seliger
|
Journal Page: 3454
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3454
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3454
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Motion to suspend three day rule fails
|
|
Journal Page: 3370
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3370
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3370
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2976
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2654
|
Senate
|
05/02/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1630
|
Senate
|
05/02/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1630
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1363
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2391
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#522
|
Journal Page: 2205
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2205
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2205
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2161
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2161
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2161
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1642
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 533
|
House
|
02/28/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 533
|
House
|
02/02/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|