Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1159 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            82R4137 CAS-D
 By: Eissler H.B. No. 1159


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to repeal on a periodic basis of the provisions of Titles 1
 and 2 of the Education Code to provide for legislative review of the
 primary state statutes governing public education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a) Effective September 1, 2013, Chapters 1, 4,
 5, 7, 8, 11, 13, and 30, Education Code, are repealed.
 (b)  Effective September 1, 2015, Chapters 34, 41, 42, 43,
 44, 45, and 46, Education Code, are repealed.
 (c)  Effective September 1, 2017, Chapters 12, 21, and 22,
 Education Code, are repealed.
 (d)  Effective September 1, 2019, Chapters 18, 19, 25, 26,
 28, 29, 30A, 31, 32, 33, 37, and 38, Education Code, are repealed.
 (e)  Effective September 1, 2021, Chapter 39, Education
 Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 2.  (a) The purpose of the repeal of chapters of the
 Education Code by Section 1 of this Act is to provide the
 legislature with the opportunity to carefully review each
 provision of Titles 1 and 2, Education Code, in order to determine:
 (1)  which individual provisions should:
 (A)  be saved from repeal during the regular
 legislative session before the date repeal is to take effect; and
 (B)  remain unmodified as part of the code;
 (2)  which individual provisions should be saved from
 repeal during the regular legislative session before the date
 repeal is to take effect but should be amended to make the provision
 or the public education system in this state more effective; and
 (3)  which individual provisions should be repealed in
 accordance with Section 1 of this Act.
 (b)  The Texas Education Agency and the Legislative Budget
 Board shall assist the legislature in reviewing and shall make
 recommendations to the legislature concerning the provisions of
 Titles 1 and 2, Education Code.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.