House | 05/04/2011 | Returned to committee by Calendars Committee | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Returned to Calendars Committee | Journal Page: 2873 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Point of order sustained | Rule 11, Section 2 and Rule 4, Section 41 | Journal Page: 2873 |
House | 05/04/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2873 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1686 | |
House | 04/06/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/01/2011 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 550 | |
House | 03/01/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 550 | |
House | 02/07/2011 | Filed |