Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB118 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: McClendon (Senate Sponsor - Uresti) H.B. No. 118
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2011;
 April 20, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 6, 2011, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 6, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requiring the provision of notice by certain hospitals
 regarding patients' medical records.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 241.103, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  A hospital shall provide written notice to a patient, or
 a patient's legally authorized representative as that term is
 defined by Section 241.151, that the hospital, unless the exception
 in Subsection (c) applies, may authorize the disposal of medical
 records relating to the patient on or after the periods specified in
 this section. The notice shall be provided to the patient or the
 patient's legally authorized representative not later than the date
 on which the patient who is or will be the subject of a medical
 record is treated, except in an emergency treatment situation. In
 an emergency treatment situation, the notice shall be provided to
 the patient or the patient's legally authorized representative as
 soon as is reasonably practicable following the emergency treatment
 situation.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *