Senate | 04/20/2011 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1275 | |
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1275 | |
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1138 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1866 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1798 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Record vote | RV#375 | Journal Page: 1799 |
House | 04/14/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1799 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1799 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1789 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1789 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Called from the table | Journal Page: 1789 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 1781 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB116 | Journal Page: 1781 |
House | 04/14/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 03/16/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 03/15/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/15/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 831 | |
House | 03/07/2011 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/07/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/07/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/28/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 02/28/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 02/28/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/28/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/11/2011 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 322 | |
House | 02/11/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 322 | |
House | 11/08/2010 | Filed |