Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1192 Latest Draft

Bill / House Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            82R23118 PMO-F
 By: Castro H.B. No. 1192
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 1192:
 By:  Eiland C.S.H.B. No. 1192


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the requirement and study of insurance coverage for
 serious emotional disturbance of a child.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1355.001, Insurance Code, is amended by
 adding Subdivision (5) to read as follows:
 (5)  "Serious emotional disturbance of a child" means
 an emotional or behavioral disorder or a neuropsychiatric condition
 that causes a person's functioning to be impaired in thought,
 perception, affect, or behavior and that:
 (A)  has been diagnosed, by a physician licensed
 to practice medicine in this state, a psychologist licensed to
 practice in this state, or a licensed professional counselor
 licensed to practice in this state, in a person who is at least
 three years of age and younger than 17 years of age; and
 (B)  meets at least one of the following criteria:
 (i)  the disorder substantially impairs the
 person's ability in at least two of the following activities or
 tasks:
 (a)  self-care;
 (b)  engaging in family relationships;
 (c)  functioning in school; or
 (d)  functioning in the community;
 (ii)  the disorder creates a risk that the
 person will be removed from the person's home and placed in a more
 restrictive environment, including in a facility or program
 operated by the Department of Family and Protective Services or an
 agency that is part of the juvenile justice system;
 (iii)  the disorder causes the person to:
 (a)  display psychotic features or
 violent behavior; or
 (b)  pose a danger to the person's self
 or others; or
 (iv)  the disorder results in the person
 meeting state special education eligibility requirements for
 serious emotional disturbance.
 SECTION 2.  The heading to Section 1355.004, Insurance Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 1355.004.  REQUIRED COVERAGE FOR SERIOUS EMOTIONAL
 DISTURBANCE OF A CHILD AND SERIOUS MENTAL ILLNESS.
 SECTION 3.  Section 1355.004, Insurance Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (c), (d), and (e) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  A group health benefit plan:
 (1)  must provide coverage for serious emotional
 disturbance of a child diagnosed as described by Section
 1355.001(5) and coverage, based on medical necessity, for serious
 mental illness for not less than the following treatments [of
 serious mental illness] in each calendar year:
 (A)  45 days of inpatient treatment; and
 (B)  60 visits for outpatient treatment,
 including group and individual outpatient treatment;
 (2)  may not include a lifetime limitation on the
 number of days of inpatient treatment or the number of visits for
 outpatient treatment covered under the plan; and
 (3)  must include the same amount limitations,
 deductibles, copayments, and coinsurance factors for serious
 emotional disturbance of a child and serious mental illness as the
 plan includes for physical illness.
 (c)  The department shall conduct a study to determine and
 evaluate the extent to which enrollees are making claims under
 coverage for serious emotional disturbance of a child and the
 impact, if any, the coverage for serious emotional disturbance of a
 child and the claims have on the cost of the coverage for group
 health benefit plans.
 (d)  Not later than August 1, 2012, the department shall
 submit to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the
 house of representatives, and the appropriate standing committees
 of the legislature a report regarding the results of the study
 required by Subsection (c), together with any recommendations for
 legislation.
 (e)  This subsection and Subsections (c) and (d) expire
 September 1, 2013.
 SECTION 4.  Section 1355.054(a), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  Benefits of coverage provided under this subchapter may
 be used only in a situation in which:
 (1)  the covered individual has a serious mental
 illness or serious emotional disturbance of a child that requires
 confinement of the individual in a hospital unless treatment is
 available through a residential treatment center for children and
 adolescents or a crisis stabilization unit; and
 (2)  the covered individual's mental illness or
 emotional disturbance:
 (A)  substantially impairs the individual's
 thought, perception of reality, emotional process, or judgment; or
 (B)  as manifested by the individual's recent
 disturbed behavior, grossly impairs the individual's behavior.
 SECTION 5.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a group health benefit plan that is delivered, issued for
 delivery, or renewed on or after January 1, 2012. A group health
 benefit plan that is delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed
 before January 1, 2012, is governed by the law as it existed
 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and that law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.