Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3515
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Motion to suspend regular order fails
|
|
Journal Page: 3515
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 3524
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2975
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2223
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 2217
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2217
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2198
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3830
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#891
|
Journal Page: 3319
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3319
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
19-Farrar
|
Journal Page: 3318
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3316
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 3315
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
16-Alonzo
|
Journal Page: 3314
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
10-Alonzo
|
Journal Page: 3309
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Point of order sustained (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 3304
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3303
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#876
|
Journal Page: 3292
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3292
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3292
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Motion prevails
|
|
Journal Page: 3292
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Motion for the previous question
|
|
Journal Page: 3291
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
8-Huberty and Oliveira
|
Journal Page: 3290
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
7-Solomons and Gutierrez
|
Journal Page: 3290
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Amended
|
5-Solomons, Hochberg, Huberty, Eissler, and Hancock
|
Journal Page: 3290
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Amendment to amendment withdrawn
|
6-Oliveira and Huberty
|
Journal Page: 3290
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
5-Solomons, Hochberg, Huberty, Eissler, and Hancock
|
Journal Page: 3289
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
2-Menendez
|
Journal Page: 3288
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3287
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/9/11 4:30 PM
|
Journal Page: 3233
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3231
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Placed on Emergency Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3300
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Returned to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3148
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Point of order sustained
|
Rule 4, Section 20(a)(5)
|
Journal Page: 3148
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 4, Section 20(a)(5)
|
Journal Page: 3147
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
5-Martinez Fischer
|
Journal Page: 3147
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3147
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#825
|
Journal Page: 3146
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
4-Farrar
|
Journal Page: 3146
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)(4)
|
Journal Page: 3142
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3140
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3138
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Placed on Emergency Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Placed on Emergency Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2781
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#659
|
Journal Page: 2780
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Calendars Committee rule adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 2780
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1072
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2011
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 456
|
House
|
02/22/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 456
|
House
|
02/16/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|