House | 05/12/2011 | Postponed | 5/12/11 11:59 PM | Journal Page: 3727 |
House | 05/12/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3726 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Record vote | RV#1026 | Journal Page: 3725 |
House | 05/12/2011 | Amended | 1-Parker | Journal Page: 3725 |
House | 05/12/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3725 | |
House | 05/09/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2324 | |
House | 04/18/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/07/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/07/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/11/2011 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 322 | |
House | 02/11/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 322 | |
House | 11/08/2010 | Filed |