E
|
05/27/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
05/27/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6460
|
E
|
05/24/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5764
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3112
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5036
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5399
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4220
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2558
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2558
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2558
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2558
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2558
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2558
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2558
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2269
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1277
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1277
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1094
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1866
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1744
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#363
|
Journal Page: 1743
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1743
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1743
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1683
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1683
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1098
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 683
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 555
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 555
|
House
|
02/09/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|