1 | 1 | | By: Veasey, Alonzo (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) H.B. No. 123 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2011; |
---|
3 | 3 | | May 5, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
---|
4 | 4 | | and Human Services; May 13, 2011, reported favorably by the |
---|
5 | 5 | | following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 13, 2011, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
9 | 9 | | AN ACT |
---|
10 | 10 | | relating to an adult diabetes education program in certain county |
---|
11 | 11 | | hospital systems and hospital districts. |
---|
12 | 12 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
13 | 13 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 1001, Health and Safety |
---|
14 | 14 | | Code, is amended by adding Section 1001.077 to read as follows: |
---|
15 | 15 | | Sec. 1001.077. ADULT DIABETES EDUCATION PROGRAM. (a) In |
---|
16 | 16 | | counties with populations of more than 100,000, the department may |
---|
17 | 17 | | assist hospital districts and county hospital systems in providing |
---|
18 | 18 | | an adult diabetes education program. The program must be based on a |
---|
19 | 19 | | curriculum developed by the Texas Diabetes Council. |
---|
20 | 20 | | (b) A hospital district or county hospital system that |
---|
21 | 21 | | participates in the program shall: |
---|
22 | 22 | | (1) make the adult diabetes education program |
---|
23 | 23 | | available in English and Spanish using the curriculum developed by |
---|
24 | 24 | | the Texas Diabetes Council; and |
---|
25 | 25 | | (2) make the education program available in the |
---|
26 | 26 | | county, including at each rural health clinic the district or |
---|
27 | 27 | | system may have. |
---|
28 | 28 | | (c) The Texas Diabetes Council shall develop for the adult |
---|
29 | 29 | | diabetes education program a curriculum emphasizing life choices |
---|
30 | 30 | | that enable a diabetic patient to control the disease and improve |
---|
31 | 31 | | the patient's standard of living. |
---|
32 | 32 | | SECTION 2. Not later than June 1, 2012, the Texas Diabetes |
---|
33 | 33 | | Council shall develop the curriculum required by Section 1001.077, |
---|
34 | 34 | | Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act. |
---|
35 | 35 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2011. |
---|
36 | 36 | | * * * * * |
---|