Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1235 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: Schwertner (Senate Sponsor - Ogden) H.B. No. 1235
22 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2011;
33 May 2, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
44 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 17, 2011, reported
55 favorably by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 17, 2011,
66 sent to printer.)
77
88
99 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
1010 AN ACT
1111 relating to the transfer of certain state property from the Texas
1212 Department of Transportation to the Parks and Wildlife Department.
1313 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1414 SECTION 1. (a) Not later than December 31, 2011, the Texas
1515 Department of Transportation shall transfer to the Parks and
1616 Wildlife Department the real property described by Subsection (d)
1717 of this section.
1818 (b) The consideration for the transfer authorized by
1919 Subsection (a) of this section is the requirement that the Parks and
2020 Wildlife Department use the property transferred only for a public
2121 park, a purpose that benefits the public interest of the state. If
2222 the Parks and Wildlife Department no longer uses the property for a
2323 public park, ownership of the property automatically reverts to the
2424 Texas Department of Transportation.
2525 (c) The Texas Department of Transportation shall transfer
2626 the property by an appropriate instrument of transfer, executed on
2727 its behalf by the commissioner of the General Land Office. The
2828 instrument of transfer must:
2929 (1) include a provision that:
3030 (A) requires the Parks and Wildlife Department to
3131 use the property for a public park, a purpose that benefits the
3232 public interest of the state;
3333 (B) allows the Parks and Wildlife Department to
3434 lease the property described by Subsection (d) to the Williamson
3535 County Parks and Recreation Department for use as a public park; and
3636 (C) indicates that ownership of the property
3737 automatically reverts to the Texas Department of Transportation if
3838 the Parks and Wildlife Department no longer uses the property for a
3939 public park; and
4040 (2) describe the property to be transferred by metes
4141 and bounds.
4242 (d) The real property to which Subsection (a) of this
4343 section refers is described as follows:
4444 A tract of land situated in the Damon Survey, Abstract No. 170, in
4545 Williamson County, Texas, being all of that called 6.180 acre tract
4646 of land (Tract 7), as shown on that unrecorded plat prepared by KC
4747 Engineering dated July 18, 1994, on ten (10) tracts of land out of
4848 that called 780.508 acre tract of land conveyed to the State of
4949 Texas, State Department of Highways and Public Transportation, by
5050 instrument recorded in Volume 1723, Page 855, of the Official
5151 Records of Williamson County, Texas.
5252 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
5353 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
5454 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
5555 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
5656 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
5757 * * * * *