E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6918
|
E
|
05/26/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6284
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3772
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5417
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5964
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5391
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3346
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3346
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3346
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3346
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3346
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3346
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3346
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2976
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2654
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 2306
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2306
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2304
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 4063
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3863
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1044
|
Journal Page: 3864
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3864
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3864
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3833
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3833
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2171
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Subcommittee meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2011
|
Subcommittee members named
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2011
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 557
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 557
|
House
|
02/10/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|