1 | 1 | | By: Pickett, Margo (Senate Sponsor - Rodriguez) H.B. No. 1254 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2011; |
---|
3 | 3 | | April 26, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
4 | 4 | | International Relations and Trade; May 10, 2011, reported |
---|
5 | 5 | | favorably by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 10, 2011, |
---|
6 | 6 | | sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
10 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 11 | | relating to consideration of the consolidation of school district |
---|
12 | 12 | | employment of peace officers and security personnel in certain |
---|
13 | 13 | | counties. |
---|
14 | 14 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
15 | 15 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 37, Education Code, is |
---|
16 | 16 | | amended by adding Section 37.0815 to read as follows: |
---|
17 | 17 | | Sec. 37.0815. CONSIDERATION OF COUNTYWIDE EMPLOYMENT OF |
---|
18 | 18 | | SCHOOL DISTRICT PEACE OFFICERS AND SECURITY PERSONNEL. (a) This |
---|
19 | 19 | | section applies only to a county with a population of 800,000 or |
---|
20 | 20 | | more that is located adjacent to an international border. |
---|
21 | 21 | | (b) Not later than January 1, 2012, the school districts in |
---|
22 | 22 | | a county subject to this section shall meet and discuss countywide |
---|
23 | 23 | | consolidation of school district employment of peace officers and |
---|
24 | 24 | | security personnel. The districts shall collect and review |
---|
25 | 25 | | information related to the employment of peace officers and |
---|
26 | 26 | | security personnel by each district and discuss the feasibility and |
---|
27 | 27 | | advisability of consolidating that employment. |
---|
28 | 28 | | (c) Not later than May 1, 2012, the school districts shall |
---|
29 | 29 | | provide a joint report to the commissioner: |
---|
30 | 30 | | (1) summarizing the information collected and |
---|
31 | 31 | | reviewed under Subsection (b); and |
---|
32 | 32 | | (2) providing recommendations concerning the |
---|
33 | 33 | | feasibility and advisability of countywide consolidation of school |
---|
34 | 34 | | district employment of peace officers and security personnel based |
---|
35 | 35 | | on the discussions under Subsection (b). |
---|
36 | 36 | | (d) This section expires September 1, 2012. |
---|
37 | 37 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
38 | 38 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
39 | 39 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
40 | 40 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
41 | 41 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2011. |
---|
42 | 42 | | * * * * * |
---|