House | 05/04/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2875 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Record vote | RV#714 | Journal Page: 2874 |
House | 05/04/2011 | Failed to pass to engrossment | Journal Page: 2874 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Amended | 1-Martinez | Journal Page: 2874 |
House | 05/04/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2874 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2092 | |
House | 04/04/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/01/2011 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 559 | |
House | 03/01/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 559 | |
House | 02/10/2011 | Filed |