House | 04/21/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1115 | |
House | 03/22/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/15/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/15/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/15/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/15/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/04/2011 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 700 | |
House | 03/01/2011 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 560 | |
House | 03/01/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 560 | |
House | 02/18/2011 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 02/11/2011 | Filed |