Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 1917
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1917
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1739
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3092
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2684
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#630
|
Journal Page: 2685
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2685
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2685
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2664
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2664
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2324
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 560
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 560
|
House
|
02/11/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|