1 | 1 | | By: Price (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 1293 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2011; |
---|
3 | 3 | | April 20, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
4 | 4 | | Intergovernmental Relations; May 19, 2011, reported favorably by |
---|
5 | 5 | | the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 19, 2011, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
9 | 9 | | AN ACT |
---|
10 | 10 | | relating to the Moore County Hospital District. |
---|
11 | 11 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
12 | 12 | | SECTION 1. Section 1064.104(b), Special District Local Laws |
---|
13 | 13 | | Code, as effective April 1, 2011, is amended to read as follows: |
---|
14 | 14 | | (b) The hospital system may include: |
---|
15 | 15 | | (1) facilities for domiciliary care and treatment of |
---|
16 | 16 | | the sick or injured; |
---|
17 | 17 | | (2) facilities for outpatient clinics; |
---|
18 | 18 | | (3) dispensaries; |
---|
19 | 19 | | (4) facilities for geriatric [domiciliary] care, |
---|
20 | 20 | | including assisted living facilities and independent elderly |
---|
21 | 21 | | living facilities; |
---|
22 | 22 | | (5) nursing [convalescent] home facilities; |
---|
23 | 23 | | (6) necessary nurses' domiciliaries and training |
---|
24 | 24 | | centers; |
---|
25 | 25 | | (7) blood banks; |
---|
26 | 26 | | (8) community mental health centers; |
---|
27 | 27 | | (9) research centers or laboratories; and |
---|
28 | 28 | | (10) any other facilities the board considers |
---|
29 | 29 | | necessary for hospital care. |
---|
30 | 30 | | SECTION 2. Section 1064.110(a), Special District Local Laws |
---|
31 | 31 | | Code, is amended to read as follows: |
---|
32 | 32 | | (a) A construction or purchase contract that involves the |
---|
33 | 33 | | expenditure of more than the amount provided by Section 271.024, |
---|
34 | 34 | | Local Government Code, [$15,000] may be made only after advertising |
---|
35 | 35 | | in the manner provided by Subchapter B, Chapter 271, Local |
---|
36 | 36 | | Government Code. |
---|
37 | 37 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
38 | 38 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
39 | 39 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
40 | 40 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
41 | 41 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2011. |
---|
42 | 42 | | * * * * * |
---|