House | 05/11/2011 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3530 | |
House | 05/07/2011 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 977 | Journal Page: 3193 |
House | 05/05/2011 | Postponed | 5/7/11 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 3083 |
House | 05/05/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3083 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Transferred to Calendars Committee | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2264 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/01/2011 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 562 | |
House | 03/01/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 562 | |
House | 02/14/2011 | Filed |