House | 04/21/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/01/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/01/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/01/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1463 | |
House | 03/22/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/08/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/08/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/08/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/08/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/01/2011 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 563 | |
House | 03/01/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 563 | |
House | 02/14/2011 | Filed |