Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1347 Latest Draft

Bill / House Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            82R20700 NC-D
 By: Hughes H.B. No. 1347
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 1347:
 By:  Workman C.S.H.B. No. 1347


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a refund of registration fees paid by home builders to
 the Texas Residential Construction Commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a)  This Act applies only to a fee paid by a
 builder after June 1, 2009, to the Texas Residential Construction
 Commission under former Section 416.004, Property Code, for an
 original or renewed certificate of registration that did not expire
 before September 1, 2009.
 (b)  This Act does not apply to a fee prorated by the Texas
 Residential Construction Commission on or after June 10, 2009.
 (c)  The comptroller shall pay to a builder a refund of the
 portion of a fee to which this section applies that is allocable to
 the number of months remaining in the registration period under the
 certificate after August 31, 2009, if the builder submits a written
 request for the refund and proof of the registration and the payment
 of the fee.
 (d)  The comptroller may adopt rules to implement this
 section.
 (e)  This section expires September 1, 2012.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.