House | 05/12/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/21/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/21/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 942 | |
House | 03/15/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/15/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/15/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/01/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/01/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/01/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/01/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/01/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/11/2011 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 323 | |
House | 02/11/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 323 | |
House | 11/08/2010 | Filed |