Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1353 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Elkins, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Williams) H.B. No. 1353
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2011;
 April 26, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 13, 2011, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 13, 2011, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to speed limits.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 545.352(b), Transportation Code, as
 amended by Chapters 663 (H.B. 385), 739 (H.B. 1075), and 1346 (H.B.
 676), Acts of the 76th Legislature, Regular Session, 1999, is
 reenacted and amended to read as follows:
 (b)  Unless a special hazard exists that requires a slower
 speed for compliance with Section 545.351(b), the following speeds
 are lawful:
 (1)  30 miles per hour in an urban district on a street
 other than an alley and 15 miles per hour in an alley;
 (2)  except as provided by Subdivision (4), 70 miles
 per hour [in daytime and 65 miles per hour in nighttime if the
 vehicle is a passenger car, motorcycle, passenger car or light
 truck towing a trailer bearing a vessel, as defined by Section
 31.003, Parks and Wildlife Code, that is less than 26 feet in
 length, passenger car or light truck towing a trailer or
 semitrailer used primarily to transport a motorcycle, or passenger
 car or light truck towing a trailer or semitrailer designed and used
 primarily to transport dogs or livestock,] on a highway numbered by
 this state or the United States outside an urban district,
 including a farm-to-market or ranch-to-market road;
 (3)  except as provided by Subdivision (4), 60 miles
 per hour [in daytime and 55 miles per hour in nighttime if the
 vehicle is a passenger car or motorcycle] on a highway that is
 outside an urban district and not a highway numbered by this state
 or the United States;
 (4)  [60 miles per hour outside an urban district if a
 speed limit for the vehicle is not otherwise specified by this
 section; or
 [(5)]  outside an urban district:
 (A)  60 miles per hour if the vehicle is a school
 bus that has passed a commercial motor vehicle inspection under
 Section 548.201 and is on a highway numbered by the United States or
 this state, including a farm-to-market road; or
 (B)  50 miles per hour if the vehicle is a school
 bus that:
 (i)  has not passed a commercial motor
 vehicle inspection under Section 548.201; or
 (ii)  is traveling on a highway not numbered
 by the United States or this state; [or
 [(C)     60 miles per hour in daytime and 55 miles per
 hour in nighttime if the vehicle is a truck, other than a light
 truck, or if the vehicle is a truck tractor, trailer, or
 semitrailer, or a vehicle towing a trailer other than a trailer
 described by Subdivision (2), semitrailer, another motor vehicle or
 towable recreational vehicle;]
 (5)  on a beach, 15 miles per hour; or
 (6)  on a county road adjacent to a public beach, 15
 miles per hour, if declared by the commissioners court of the
 county.
 SECTION 2.  Section 545.352, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  An entity that establishes or alters a speed limit under
 this subchapter shall establish the same speed limit for daytime
 and nighttime.
 SECTION 3.  Sections 545.353(d), (h), and (h-1),
 Transportation Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (d)  Except as provided by Subsection (h-1) [(h)], the
 commission may not:
 (1)  modify the rules established by Section
 545.351(b);
 (2)  establish a speed limit of more than 75 [70] miles
 per hour; or
 (3)  increase the speed limit for a vehicle described
 by Section 545.352(b)(4) [545.352(b)(5)].
 (h)  Notwithstanding Section 545.352(b), the commission may
 establish a speed limit of 75 miles per hour [in daytime] on a part
 of the highway system if[:
 [(1)]  the commission determines that 75 miles per hour
 [in daytime] is a reasonable and safe speed for that part of the
 highway system[; and
 [(2)     that part of the highway is located in a county
 with a population density of less than 15 persons per square mile].
 (h-1)  Notwithstanding Section 545.352(b), the commission
 may establish a speed limit of 80 miles per hour [in daytime] on a
 part of Interstate Highway 10 or Interstate Highway 20 in Crockett,
 Culberson, Hudspeth, Jeff Davis, Kerr, Kimble, Pecos, Reeves,
 Sutton, or Ward County if the commission determines that 80 miles
 per hour [in daytime] is a reasonable and safe speed for that part
 of the highway.
 SECTION 4.  Section 545.354(e), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (e)  The authority may not:
 (1)  alter the general rule established by Section
 545.351(a); or
 (2)  establish a speed limit of more than 75 [70] miles
 per hour.
 SECTION 5.  Section 545.355(e), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (e)  The commissioners court of a county with a population of
 more than 2.8 million may establish from the results of an
 engineering and traffic investigation a speed limit of not more
 than 75 [70] miles per hour on any part of a highway of that county
 that is a limited-access or controlled-access highway, regardless
 of the location of the part of the highway.
 SECTION 6.  Sections 545.356(a) and (b), Transportation
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The governing body of a municipality, for a highway or
 part of a highway in the municipality, including a highway of the
 state highway system, has the same authority to alter by ordinance
 prima facie speed limits from the results of an engineering and
 traffic investigation as the Texas Transportation Commission on an
 officially designated or marked highway of the state highway
 system. The governing body of a municipality may not modify the
 rule established by Section 545.351(a) or establish a speed limit
 of more than 75 [60] miles per hour.
 (b)  The governing body of a municipality, for a highway or
 part of a highway in the municipality, including a highway of the
 state highway system, has the same authority to alter prima facie
 speed limits from the results of an engineering and traffic
 investigation as the commission for an officially designated or
 marked highway of the state highway system, when the highway or part
 of the highway is under repair, construction, or maintenance. A
 municipality may not modify the rule established by Section
 545.351(a) or establish a speed limit of more than 75 [60] miles per
 hour.
 SECTION 7.  Section 545.358, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 545.358.  AUTHORITY OF COMMANDING OFFICER OF UNITED
 STATES MILITARY RESERVATION TO ALTER SPEED LIMITS. The commanding
 officer of a United States military reservation, for a highway or
 part of a highway in the military reservation, including a highway
 of the state highway system, has the same authority by order to
 alter prima facie speed limits from the results of an engineering
 and traffic investigation as the Texas Transportation Commission
 for an officially designated or marked highway of the state highway
 system. A commanding officer may not modify the rule established by
 Section 545.351(a) or establish a speed limit of more than 75 [60]
 miles per hour.
 SECTION 8.  Section 545.362(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Subject to Subsection (c), the Texas Transportation
 Commission may enter an order establishing prima facie speed limits
 of not more than 75 [70] miles per hour applicable to all highways,
 including a turnpike under the authority of the Texas Turnpike
 Authority or a highway under the control of a municipality or
 county. An order entered under this section does not have the
 effect of increasing a speed limit on any highway.
 SECTION 9.  Section 545.353(i), Transportation Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 10.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the Texas Department of Transportation shall conceal
 or remove speed limit signs that do not comply with Section 545.352,
 Transportation Code, as amended by this Act, and erect appropriate
 signs.
 SECTION 11.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *